THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:32:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 208
Northgate Square
1500 Fisher Street
North Bay Ontario P1B 2H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 476-7737
Fax: (705) 476-7177

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 18 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephane Gauthier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gauthier (CPSO#: 84971 )
Business Address: Suite 208
Northgate Square
1500 Fisher Street
North Bay Ontario P1B 2H3
(705) 476-7737

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 208
Northgate Square
1500 Fisher Street
North Bay Ontario P1B 2H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 476-7737
Fax: (705) 476-7177

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 18 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephane Gauthier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gauthier (CPSO#: 84971 )
Business Address: Suite 208
Northgate Square
1500 Fisher Street
North Bay Ontario P1B 2H3
(705) 476-7737

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANE MICHEL GAUTHIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAUTHIER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANE MICHEL GAUTHIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAUTHIER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006