THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/04/25 11:09:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 58 Goodall Street
Dryden Ontario P8N 2Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-807-223-8200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 60 Princess Street
Dryden Ontario P8N 1C7
Phone: 807-220-4275
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 18 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Izabela Apriasz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Apriasz (CPSO#: 84981 )
Business Address: 42-C Earl Avenue
Dryden Ontario P8N 1X5
(807) 220-4275
Business Address: 58 Goodall Street
Dryden Ontario P8N 2Z6
(807) 223-8200
Business Address: 87 Spruce Street
Vermilion Bay Ontario P0V 2V0
(807) 227-2675

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 58 Goodall Street
Dryden Ontario P8N 2Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-807-223-8200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 60 Princess Street
Dryden Ontario P8N 1C7
Phone: 807-220-4275
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 18 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Izabela Apriasz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Apriasz (CPSO#: 84981 )
Business Address: 42-C Earl Avenue
Dryden Ontario P8N 1X5
(807) 220-4275
Business Address: 58 Goodall Street
Dryden Ontario P8N 2Z6
(807) 223-8200
Business Address: 87 Spruce Street
Vermilion Bay Ontario P0V 2V0
(807) 227-2675

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IZABELA APRIASZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. APRIASZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IZABELA APRIASZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. APRIASZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Aug 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006