THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:07:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7700
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 31 Dec 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tina Hsu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hsu (CPSO#: 84998 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-7700 Extn: 70185

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7700
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 31 Dec 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tina Hsu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hsu (CPSO#: 84998 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-7700 Extn: 70185

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TINA YUN-CHIN HSU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HSU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TINA YUN-CHIN HSU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HSU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Oct 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006