THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 06:03:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
McLaughlin 2 - 405
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5118
Fax: (416) 603-6494

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: KJ Chin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chin (CPSO#: 85039 )
Business Address: UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
McLaughlin 2 - 405
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5118

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
McLaughlin 2 - 405
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5118
Fax: (416) 603-6494

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: KJ Chin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chin (CPSO#: 85039 )
Business Address: UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
McLaughlin 2 - 405
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5118

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KI JINN CHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KI JINN CHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006