THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:55:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 525 Belmont Ave W
Unit 206 B
Kitchener ON N2M 5E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5199541800
Fax: 519-954-2300
Address: Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
DocuDavit Solutions
28 Eugene Street
Toronto, Ontario
M6B 3Z4

Tel: (416) 781-9083
Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083
Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 16 May 2013

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Jordan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rola Zamel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Zamel (CPSO#: 85070 )
Business Address: 4 - 900 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G5
(519) 954-1800
Business Address: 525 Belmont Ave W
Unit 206 B
Kitchener ON N2M 5E2
519-954-1800

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 525 Belmont Ave W
Unit 206 B
Kitchener ON N2M 5E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5199541800
Fax: 519-954-2300
Address: Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
DocuDavit Solutions
28 Eugene Street
Toronto, Ontario
M6B 3Z4

Tel: (416) 781-9083
Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083
Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 16 May 2013

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Jordan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rola Zamel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Zamel (CPSO#: 85070 )
Business Address: 4 - 900 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G5
(519) 954-1800
Business Address: 525 Belmont Ave W
Unit 206 B
Kitchener ON N2M 5E2
519-954-1800

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROLA ZAMEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAMEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROLA ZAMEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAMEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006