THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 02:55:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: SimcoDerm Centre
105 - 5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 503-6333
Fax: (705) 503-6330
Address: Richmond Hill Medical and
Surgical Centre
Unit 12 Level 2
9080 Yonge St
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0Y7
Phone: (289) 597-7675
Fax: (289) 597-7675

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shayesteh Alam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shayesteh Alam (CPSO#: 85096 )
Business Address: Suite 105
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
(705) 503-6333

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: SimcoDerm Centre
105 - 5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 503-6333
Fax: (705) 503-6330
Address: Richmond Hill Medical and
Surgical Centre
Unit 12 Level 2
9080 Yonge St
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0Y7
Phone: (289) 597-7675
Fax: (289) 597-7675

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shayesteh Alam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shayesteh Alam (CPSO#: 85096 )
Business Address: Suite 105
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
(705) 503-6333

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARYAM SHAYESTEH ALAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAYESTEH ALAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARYAM SHAYESTEH ALAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAYESTEH ALAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 17 Jan 2018
Summary:
Effective November 13, 2018, Dr. Maryam Shayesteh Alam has completed all components of her SCERP.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP: 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 17 Jan 2018
Summary:
Effective November 13, 2018, Dr. Maryam Shayesteh Alam has completed all components of her SCERP.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP: 

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006