THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:33:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: SAINT LOUIS UNIVERSITY, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FILIPINO

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 450 Bronte Street South
Suite 201
Milton Ontario L9T 8T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-851-0774
Fax: 289-851-0776

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. LEILANI FAMORCA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Famorca (CPSO#: 85121 )
Business Address: 450 Bronte Street South
suite 201
POSTAL CODE is L9T8T2
Milton Ontario J4Y 0K7
289-851-0774

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FILIPINO
Medical School: SAINT LOUIS UNIVERSITY, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 450 Bronte Street South
Suite 201
Milton Ontario L9T 8T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-851-0774
Fax: 289-851-0776

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. LEILANI FAMORCA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Famorca (CPSO#: 85121 )
Business Address: 450 Bronte Street South
suite 201
POSTAL CODE is L9T8T2
Milton Ontario J4Y 0K7
289-851-0774

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEILANI CASILDA DE LEON FAMORCA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAMORCA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEILANI CASILDA DE LEON FAMORCA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAMORCA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: SAINT LOUIS UNIVERSITY, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Sep 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006