THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:13:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-1 Huron St
Collingwood ON L9Y 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 444-1648
Fax: (705) 444-1909

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 May 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 09 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Behzad Etemadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Etemadi (CPSO#: 85142 )
Business Address: 1 Huron Street
Suite 201
Collingwood Ontario L9Y1c3
7054441648

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-1 Huron St
Collingwood ON L9Y 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 444-1648
Fax: (705) 444-1909

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 May 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 09 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Behzad Etemadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Etemadi (CPSO#: 85142 )
Business Address: 1 Huron Street
Suite 201
Collingwood Ontario L9Y1c3
7054441648

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BEHZAD ALI SANII ETEMADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ETEMADI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BEHZAD ALI SANII ETEMADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ETEMADI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006