THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 02:56:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Industrial De Santander, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 24 Huron Street West
Exeter Ontario N0M 1S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 235-2700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 23 Huron Street West
Exeter Ontario N0M 1S2
Phone: (519) 235-3343
Fax: (519) 235-3845

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bueno-Patino Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bueno Patino (CPSO#: 85218 )
Business Address: 24 Huron Street West
Exeter Ontario N0M 1S2
(519) 235-2700

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Industrial De Santander, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 24 Huron Street West
Exeter Ontario N0M 1S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 235-2700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 23 Huron Street West
Exeter Ontario N0M 1S2
Phone: (519) 235-3343
Fax: (519) 235-3845

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bueno-Patino Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bueno Patino (CPSO#: 85218 )
Business Address: 24 Huron Street West
Exeter Ontario N0M 1S2
(519) 235-2700

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIO BUENO PATINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUENO PATINO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIO BUENO PATINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUENO PATINO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Industrial De Santander, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006