THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:02:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Nagpur University, 1983
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 503-4789 Yonge St
North York ON M2N 0G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-748-0100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Myta Peters Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Oct 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Peters (CPSO#: 85221 )
Business Address: 503-4789 Yonge St
North York ON M2N 0G3
Business Address: Hullmark Corporate Centre
503-4789 Yonge Street
North York Ontario M2N 0G3
(647) 748-0100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Nagpur University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 503-4789 Yonge St
North York ON M2N 0G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-748-0100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Myta Peters Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Oct 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Peters (CPSO#: 85221 )
Business Address: 503-4789 Yonge St
North York ON M2N 0G3
Business Address: Hullmark Corporate Centre
503-4789 Yonge Street
North York Ontario M2N 0G3
(647) 748-0100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MYTA PETERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETERS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MYTA PETERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETERS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Nagpur University, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006