THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:48:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Fac De Medicina Generala Din Craiova, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Avenue
Lab Medicine Building, room #113
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 13537
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mihaela Marinescu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Marinescu (CPSO#: 85240 )
Business Address: Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Suite H-2361
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
(613) 938-4240 Extn: 4428
Business Address: 1053 Carling Av, Lab Med, room 113
OTTAWA ON K1Y 4E9
(613)798-5555*13537

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: Fac De Medicina Generala Din Craiova, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Avenue
Lab Medicine Building, room #113
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 13537
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mihaela Marinescu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Marinescu (CPSO#: 85240 )
Business Address: Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Suite H-2361
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
(613) 938-4240 Extn: 4428
Business Address: 1053 Carling Av, Lab Med, room 113
OTTAWA ON K1Y 4E9
(613)798-5555*13537

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIHAELA MARINESCU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARINESCU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIHAELA MARINESCU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARINESCU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Fac De Medicina Generala Din Craiova, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006