THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:08:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Burlington Children's clinic
Unit 10-14
Suit 103
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)634-1311
Fax: 905-634-7202

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 09 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M.J. Shalan Al-Gazi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shalan Al-Gazi (CPSO#: 85243 )
Business Address: Burlington Children's Clinic
Suite 103
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3N2
(905) 634-1311

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Burlington Children's clinic
Unit 10-14
Suit 103
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)634-1311
Fax: 905-634-7202

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 09 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M.J. Shalan Al-Gazi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shalan Al-Gazi (CPSO#: 85243 )
Business Address: Burlington Children's Clinic
Suite 103
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3N2
(905) 634-1311

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHANAD JOODI SHALAN AL-GAZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHALAN AL-GAZI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHANAD JOODI SHALAN AL-GAZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHALAN AL-GAZI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006