THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:02:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 25 Industrial St
Toronto ON M4G 1Z2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-429-0202
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 02 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lee Chong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lee Chong (CPSO#: 85251 )
Business Address: 222 Dixon Road
Suite 106
Etobicoke Ontario M9P 3S5
Business Address: 25 Industrial St
Toronto ON M4G 1Z2
Business Address: 586 Eglinton Ave E
Toronto ON M4P 1P2
416 489 3263

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 25 Industrial St
Toronto ON M4G 1Z2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-429-0202
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 02 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lee Chong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lee Chong (CPSO#: 85251 )
Business Address: 222 Dixon Road
Suite 106
Etobicoke Ontario M9P 3S5
Business Address: 25 Industrial St
Toronto ON M4G 1Z2
Business Address: 586 Eglinton Ave E
Toronto ON M4P 1P2
416 489 3263

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMY PATRICIA LEE KWEE LAN LEE CHONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE CHONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMY PATRICIA LEE KWEE LAN LEE CHONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE CHONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 May 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006