THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:35:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 101
525 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 880-3695
Fax: (519) 749-2452

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 09 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr T Sichilima Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Jun 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 101
525 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 880-3695
Fax: (519) 749-2452

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 09 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr T Sichilima Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Jun 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TANGU SICHILIMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SICHILIMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TANGU SICHILIMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SICHILIMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Apr 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Apr 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006