THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/04/25 23:49:10 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7982 Yonge Street
Innisfil Ontario L9S 1L5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-728-8040
Fax: 705-728-1676

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mehrak Kilani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Sep 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kilani (CPSO#: 85278 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7982 Yonge Street
Innisfil Ontario L9S 1L5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-728-8040
Fax: 705-728-1676

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mehrak Kilani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Sep 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kilani (CPSO#: 85278 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEHRAK KILANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KILANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEHRAK KILANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KILANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Sep 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006