THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 05:42:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: RVAP
Department of Anaesthesia
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Constantinescu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Constantinescu (CPSO#: 85282 )
Business Address: RVAP
Department of Anaesthesia
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
(905) 683-2320

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: RVAP
Department of Anaesthesia
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Constantinescu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Constantinescu (CPSO#: 85282 )
Business Address: RVAP
Department of Anaesthesia
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
(905) 683-2320

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CORINA MARIANA CONSTANTINESCU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONSTANTINESCU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CORINA MARIANA CONSTANTINESCU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONSTANTINESCU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006