THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 16:53:51 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Geneva, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Victoria Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
Room B1 181
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 58107
Fax: (519) 685-8171

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 02 May 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 02 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sandrine De Ribaupierre Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. De Ribaupierre (CPSO#: 85341 )
Business Address: LHSC - Victoria Campus Site
Division of Neurosurgery
Room B1 181
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500 Extn: 58107

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Geneva, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Victoria Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
Room B1 181
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 58107
Fax: (519) 685-8171

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 02 May 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 02 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sandrine De Ribaupierre Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. De Ribaupierre (CPSO#: 85341 )
Business Address: LHSC - Victoria Campus Site
Division of Neurosurgery
Room B1 181
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500 Extn: 58107

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANDRINE NATHALIE DE RIBAUPIERRE may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO in which Dr. DE RIBAUPIERRE holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. DE RIBAUPIERRE may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. DE RIBAUPIERRE no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. DE RIBAUPIERRE no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. DE RIBAUPIERRE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANDRINE NATHALIE DE RIBAUPIERRE may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO in which Dr. DE RIBAUPIERRE holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. DE RIBAUPIERRE may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. DE RIBAUPIERRE no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. DE RIBAUPIERRE no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. DE RIBAUPIERRE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Geneva, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2006