THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:40:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kasturba Medical College, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 299 Dundas St E
Lotus Counselling Services
Waterdown Ontario L0R 2H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-800-1118
Fax: 888-314-3299
Address: 347 Colborne St
Brantford ON N3S 3N2
Phone: (519) 753-9581
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Dec 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.U.PARTHASARATHI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. U. Parthasarathi (CPSO#: 85359 )
Business Address: 3400 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 1B3
Business Address: 1394 Hazelton Blvd
Burlington ON L7P 4V3
4164000024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, TAMIL
Medical School: Kasturba Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 299 Dundas St E
Lotus Counselling Services
Waterdown Ontario L0R 2H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-800-1118
Fax: 888-314-3299
Address: 347 Colborne St
Brantford ON N3S 3N2
Phone: (519) 753-9581
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Dec 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.U.PARTHASARATHI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. U. Parthasarathi (CPSO#: 85359 )
Business Address: 3400 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 1B3
Business Address: 1394 Hazelton Blvd
Burlington ON L7P 4V3
4164000024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. USHA DEVI PARTHASARATHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARTHASARATHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. USHA DEVI PARTHASARATHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARTHASARATHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kasturba Medical College, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2006