THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/04/25 19:20:27 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Stellenbosch, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1230 Northshore Boulevard
Burlington Ontario L7S 1W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 333-4262
Fax: (905) 333-9262
Address: 6-1401 Plains Road East
Burlington , Ontario
Burlington Ontario L7R 3P9
Phone: (905) 333-4262
Fax: (905) 333-9262

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Noel R. Amaladoss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Amaladoss (CPSO#: 85368 )
Business Address: Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1230 Northshore Boulevard
Burlington Ontario L7S 1W7
(905) 333-4262
Business Address: Unit 6
1401 Plains Road East
Burlington Ontario L7S 3P9
(905) 333-4262

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Stellenbosch, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1230 Northshore Boulevard
Burlington Ontario L7S 1W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 333-4262
Fax: (905) 333-9262
Address: 6-1401 Plains Road East
Burlington , Ontario
Burlington Ontario L7R 3P9
Phone: (905) 333-4262
Fax: (905) 333-9262

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Noel R. Amaladoss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Amaladoss (CPSO#: 85368 )
Business Address: Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1230 Northshore Boulevard
Burlington Ontario L7S 1W7
(905) 333-4262
Business Address: Unit 6
1401 Plains Road East
Burlington Ontario L7S 3P9
(905) 333-4262

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NOEL RUFUS AMALADOSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMALADOSS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NOEL RUFUS AMALADOSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMALADOSS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Stellenbosch, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2006