THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:18:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Emergency Room
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Extension: 2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 238 Grand River Street North
Brant Ontario N3L 2N7
Phone: 5194422251
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Poon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Poon (CPSO#: 85398 )
Business Address: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Emergency Department
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
(519) 621-2330

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Emergency Room
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Extension: 2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 238 Grand River Street North
Brant Ontario N3L 2N7
Phone: 5194422251
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Poon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Poon (CPSO#: 85398 )
Business Address: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Emergency Department
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
(519) 621-2330

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEREK IVAN POON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEREK IVAN POON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2006
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2006