THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:43:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 209
170 McEwan Drive
Bolton Ontario L7E 4C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 951-7525
Fax: (905) 951-3419

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Feb 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 15 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Gagnon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 May 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gagnon (CPSO#: 85425 )
Business Address: Suite 209
170 McEwan Drive
Bolton Ontario L7E 4C8
(905) 951-7525

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 209
170 McEwan Drive
Bolton Ontario L7E 4C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 951-7525
Fax: (905) 951-3419

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Feb 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 15 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Gagnon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 May 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gagnon (CPSO#: 85425 )
Business Address: Suite 209
170 McEwan Drive
Bolton Ontario L7E 4C8
(905) 951-7525

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL PAUL GAGNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAGNON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL PAUL GAGNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAGNON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2006
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2006