THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:44:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 782 Richmond St
London ON N6A 3H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196015437
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 15 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Samim Al-Qadhi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Al-Qadhi (CPSO#: 85445 )
Business Address: 782 Richmond St
Dr. Samim Paediatric and Adolescent Care
London ON N6A 3H5
5196015437

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 782 Richmond St
London ON N6A 3H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196015437
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 15 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Samim Al-Qadhi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Al-Qadhi (CPSO#: 85445 )
Business Address: 782 Richmond St
Dr. Samim Paediatric and Adolescent Care
London ON N6A 3H5
5196015437

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMIM AZIZ ARIF AL-QADHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-QADHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMIM AZIZ ARIF AL-QADHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-QADHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Mar 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Oct 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 2006