THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/04/25 00:15:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart St
Room 22.2.369, Davies 2
Kingston Health Sciences Center
Kingston Health Sciences Center
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-549-6666
Extension: 0
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Respirology
Effective: 07 Oct 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heffernan & Milne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Heffernan (CPSO#: 85458 ) Dr. L. Milne (CPSO#: 88747 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-2394
Business Address: Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 1E2
(613) 969-7400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart St
Room 22.2.369, Davies 2
Kingston Health Sciences Center
Kingston Health Sciences Center
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-549-6666
Extension: 0
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Respirology
Effective: 07 Oct 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heffernan & Milne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Heffernan (CPSO#: 85458 ) Dr. L. Milne (CPSO#: 88747 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-2394
Business Address: Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 1E2
(613) 969-7400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL MICHAEL HEFFERNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEFFERNAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL MICHAEL HEFFERNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEFFERNAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Sep 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2006