THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/04/25 11:43:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: U ESTADUAL PAULISTA-BOTUCATU SAO PAOLO, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 221 Brant Ave
Brantford Radiology Group
Brantford ON N3T 3J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-750-7333
Fax: 519-750-7339
Address: 1-353 St Paul Ave
Brantford ON N3R 4N3
Phone: 519-759-6089
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 40 Shellington Place
Brantford ON N3S 0C5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 270 King George Rd
Brantford ON N3R 5L5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 60 Hatt St
Dundas ON L9H 7T6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E E Carvalho Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Carvalho (CPSO#: 85463 )
Business Address: 298 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2N 3B1
(416) 223-6500
Business Address: 1-40 Shellington Place
Brantford ON N3S 0C5
Business Address: 1-353 St Paul Ave
Brantford ON N3R 4N3
Business Address: 3-270 King George Rd
Brantford ON N3R 5L5
Business Address: 60 Hatt St
Dundas ON L9H 7T6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: U ESTADUAL PAULISTA-BOTUCATU SAO PAOLO, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 221 Brant Ave
Brantford Radiology Group
Brantford ON N3T 3J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-750-7333
Fax: 519-750-7339
Address: 1-353 St Paul Ave
Brantford ON N3R 4N3
Phone: 519-759-6089
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 40 Shellington Place
Brantford ON N3S 0C5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 270 King George Rd
Brantford ON N3R 5L5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 60 Hatt St
Dundas ON L9H 7T6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E E Carvalho Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Carvalho (CPSO#: 85463 )
Business Address: 298 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2N 3B1
(416) 223-6500
Business Address: 1-40 Shellington Place
Brantford ON N3S 0C5
Business Address: 1-353 St Paul Ave
Brantford ON N3R 4N3
Business Address: 3-270 King George Rd
Brantford ON N3R 5L5
Business Address: 60 Hatt St
Dundas ON L9H 7T6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELDA EVELINE CARVALHO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARVALHO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELDA EVELINE CARVALHO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARVALHO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: U ESTADUAL PAULISTA-BOTUCATU SAO PAOLO, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2006