THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:14:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Islamia University, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2475 Dougall Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 1T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519)-252-4448
Fax: (519)-252-4443
Address: 33 Princess Street
Leamington Ontario N8H 5C5
Phone: 519-325-1333
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Oshawa Durham Sleep Lab
292 King Street West
Oshawa Ontario L1J 2J9
Phone: (905) 436-6163
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Phone: 5192545577
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 14 Jun 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sukarno N. Chaudhry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chaudhry (CPSO#: 85486 )
Business Address: 1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577
Business Address: 2475 Dougall Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 1T3
(519) 252-4448
Business Address: 33 Princess Street
Leamington Ontario N8H 5C5
(519) 325-1333
Business Address: 292 King Street West
Oshawa Ontario L1J 2J9
(905) 436-6163

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Islamia University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2475 Dougall Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 1T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519)-252-4448
Fax: (519)-252-4443
Address: 33 Princess Street
Leamington Ontario N8H 5C5
Phone: 519-325-1333
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Oshawa Durham Sleep Lab
292 King Street West
Oshawa Ontario L1J 2J9
Phone: (905) 436-6163
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Phone: 5192545577
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 14 Jun 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sukarno N. Chaudhry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chaudhry (CPSO#: 85486 )
Business Address: 1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577
Business Address: 2475 Dougall Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 1T3
(519) 252-4448
Business Address: 33 Princess Street
Leamington Ontario N8H 5C5
(519) 325-1333
Business Address: 292 King Street West
Oshawa Ontario L1J 2J9
(905) 436-6163

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUKARNO NAWAZ CHAUDHRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDHRY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUKARNO NAWAZ CHAUDHRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDHRY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Islamia University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2006
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2006