THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:08:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Central De Venezuela, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2951 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 4Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-3369615
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 438 Hughson Street North
Hamilton Ontario L8L 4N5
Phone: (905) 523-6611
Fax: (905) 523-8735

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Mar 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 15 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pascual Candia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. p. candia (CPSO#: 85512 )
Business Address: 438 Hughson Street North
Hamilton Ontario L8L 4N5
(905) 523-6611
Business Address: 2079 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7R 1E2
(905) 634-1625
Business Address: 2951 Walker's Line
Burlington ON L7M 4Y1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Central De Venezuela, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2951 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 4Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-3369615
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 438 Hughson Street North
Hamilton Ontario L8L 4N5
Phone: (905) 523-6611
Fax: (905) 523-8735

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Mar 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 15 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pascual Candia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. p. candia (CPSO#: 85512 )
Business Address: 438 Hughson Street North
Hamilton Ontario L8L 4N5
(905) 523-6611
Business Address: 2079 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7R 1E2
(905) 634-1625
Business Address: 2951 Walker's Line
Burlington ON L7M 4Y1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PASCUAL REMBERTO CANDIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CANDIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PASCUAL REMBERTO CANDIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CANDIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Central De Venezuela, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Nov 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2006