THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:47:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 212-6 Jackes Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4T 0A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 0000000000000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 12 Jan 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 12 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N T Siddiqui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shahid (CPSO#: 85517 ) Dr. N. Siddiqui (CPSO#: 82092 )
Business Address: 212-6 Jackes Ave
Toronto ON M4T 0A5
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia and Pain Management
Unit 19-104
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-5270

Corporation Name: Azmeh Shahid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shahid (CPSO#: 85517 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 212-6 Jackes Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4T 0A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 0000000000000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 12 Jan 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 12 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N T Siddiqui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shahid (CPSO#: 85517 ) Dr. N. Siddiqui (CPSO#: 82092 )
Business Address: 212-6 Jackes Ave
Toronto ON M4T 0A5
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia and Pain Management
Unit 19-104
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-5270

Corporation Name: Azmeh Shahid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shahid (CPSO#: 85517 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 May 2017
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 12 2017
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Azmeh Shahid may practise medicine independently in child and adolescent
psychiatry.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Azmeh Shahid may practise medicine independently in child and adolescent
psychiatry.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 May 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 May 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Oct 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2006