THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:38:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: Anver Kalla, Zaheera (Used Until: 07 Sep 2006)
Medical School: University of Pretoria School of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bayview Family Physicians
Suite 203
9160 Bayview Avenue
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 0E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 889-7997
Fax: 905-889-2666

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
South Africa

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zaheera Abba Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Abba (CPSO#: 85522 )
Business Address: Bayview Family Physicians
203 - 9160 Bayview Avenue
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 0E9
(905) 889-7997
Business Address: 203-9160 Bayview Ave
Richmond Hill ON L4B 0E6
905-889-7997 Extn: 1

General Information

Former Name: Anver Kalla, Zaheera (Used Until: 07 Sep 2006)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Pretoria School of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bayview Family Physicians
Suite 203
9160 Bayview Avenue
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 0E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 889-7997
Fax: 905-889-2666

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
South Africa

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zaheera Abba Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Abba (CPSO#: 85522 )
Business Address: Bayview Family Physicians
203 - 9160 Bayview Avenue
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 0E9
(905) 889-7997
Business Address: 203-9160 Bayview Ave
Richmond Hill ON L4B 0E6
905-889-7997 Extn: 1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZAHEERA ABBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABBA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZAHEERA ABBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABBA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Pretoria School of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2006
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2006