THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:43:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300 Rossland Rd E
Ajax ON L1Z 0M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-245-0711
Fax: 905-245-0522
Address: Lakeridge Health
The Oshawa Hospital
1 Hospital Court
Durham Ontario L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 9390 Woodbine Ave
King Square Medical center
Suite 1E3
Markham ON L6C 0M5
Phone: 9057664700
Fax: 9056700767
Address: 50 McIntosh Dr
246
Markham ON L3R 9T3
Phone: 905-604-6094
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 470 Bronte St S
Skon Laser Clinic
Milton ON L9T 2J4
Phone: (289) 878-3361
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 901-2225 Sheppard Ave E
North York ON M2J 5C2
Phone: 905-201-3419
Fax: 905-471-7447
Address: 270 Charlotte Street
Unit 201
Peterborough Ontario K9J 2V4
Phone: 877-576-3878
Fax: 877-576-3878
Address: 9080 Yonge Street
Level 2, Unit 12
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0Y7
Phone: 289-597-7676
Fax: 289-597-7675
Address: 22-30 Wertheim Crt
Richmond Hill ON L4B 1B9
Phone: (905) 482-3389
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 7191 Yonge Street #1006
Thornhill, ON L3T 0C4
Thornhill Ontario L3T 0C4
Phone: 905-597-7661
Fax: 905-597-7662

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abdel Hadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Abdel Hadi (CPSO#: 85555 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711
Business Address: Suite 108
7100 Woodbine Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 5J2
Business Address: 80 Glen Shields Avenue
Suite 5
Concord Ontario L4K 1T7
Business Address: 7191 Yonge Street
Suite 1006
Thornhill Ontario L3T 0C4
Business Address: Unit 12
80 Finch Avenue West
North York Ontario M2N 2H4
Business Address: Unit 12
9080 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0Y7
Business Address: 2 Champagne Drive
Toronto Ontario M3J 0K2
Business Address: 7095 Woodbine Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 1A3
Business Address: 238 Main Street East
Milton Ontario L9T 1N8
Business Address: 50 Absolute Avenue
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 0B8
Business Address: 304 - 2347 Kennedy Road
Scarborough Ontario M1T 3T8
(416) 754-1010

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300 Rossland Rd E
Ajax ON L1Z 0M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-245-0711
Fax: 905-245-0522
Address: Lakeridge Health
The Oshawa Hospital
1 Hospital Court
Durham Ontario L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 9390 Woodbine Ave
King Square Medical center
Suite 1E3
Markham ON L6C 0M5
Phone: 9057664700
Fax: 9056700767
Address: 50 McIntosh Dr
246
Markham ON L3R 9T3
Phone: 905-604-6094
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 470 Bronte St S
Skon Laser Clinic
Milton ON L9T 2J4
Phone: (289) 878-3361
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 901-2225 Sheppard Ave E
North York ON M2J 5C2
Phone: 905-201-3419
Fax: 905-471-7447
Address: 270 Charlotte Street
Unit 201
Peterborough Ontario K9J 2V4
Phone: 877-576-3878
Fax: 877-576-3878
Address: 9080 Yonge Street
Level 2, Unit 12
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0Y7
Phone: 289-597-7676
Fax: 289-597-7675
Address: 22-30 Wertheim Crt
Richmond Hill ON L4B 1B9
Phone: (905) 482-3389
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 7191 Yonge Street #1006
Thornhill, ON L3T 0C4
Thornhill Ontario L3T 0C4
Phone: 905-597-7661
Fax: 905-597-7662

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abdel Hadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Abdel Hadi (CPSO#: 85555 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711
Business Address: Suite 108
7100 Woodbine Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 5J2
Business Address: 80 Glen Shields Avenue
Suite 5
Concord Ontario L4K 1T7
Business Address: 7191 Yonge Street
Suite 1006
Thornhill Ontario L3T 0C4
Business Address: Unit 12
80 Finch Avenue West
North York Ontario M2N 2H4
Business Address: Unit 12
9080 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0Y7
Business Address: 2 Champagne Drive
Toronto Ontario M3J 0K2
Business Address: 7095 Woodbine Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 1A3
Business Address: 238 Main Street East
Milton Ontario L9T 1N8
Business Address: 50 Absolute Avenue
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 0B8
Business Address: 304 - 2347 Kennedy Road
Scarborough Ontario M1T 3T8
(416) 754-1010

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARID MOSTAFA ABDEL HADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL HADI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARID MOSTAFA ABDEL HADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL HADI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 10 Feb 2021
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 10 Feb 2021
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Nov 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2006