THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 03:40:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
PO Box 1800
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-7111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen Held Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Feb 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Held (CPSO#: 85615 )
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7111
Business Address: Suite 101
377 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
(905) 471-9999

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
PO Box 1800
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-7111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen Held Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Feb 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Held (CPSO#: 85615 )
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7111
Business Address: Suite 101
377 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
(905) 471-9999

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN ANN HELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HELD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN ANN HELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HELD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Oct 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Nov 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2006