THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:17:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. Matthew's University, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1083 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Ontario N9A 4J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-915-7125
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 991 Woodland Cres
Belle River ON N0R 1A0
Phone: 519-915-4514
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 620 Kenwood Blvd
Lasalle ON N9J 0C9
Phone: 519-915-4514
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jul 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kristen Kupeyan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kupeyan (CPSO#: 85660 )
Business Address: Ouellette Health Centre
1083 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 4J8
(519) 915-7125
Business Address: Hospitalist Office
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4411 Extn: 33319

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. Matthew's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1083 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Ontario N9A 4J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-915-7125
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 991 Woodland Cres
Belle River ON N0R 1A0
Phone: 519-915-4514
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 620 Kenwood Blvd
Lasalle ON N9J 0C9
Phone: 519-915-4514
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jul 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kristen Kupeyan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kupeyan (CPSO#: 85660 )
Business Address: Ouellette Health Centre
1083 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 4J8
(519) 915-7125
Business Address: Hospitalist Office
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4411 Extn: 33319

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTEN ANN KUPEYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUPEYAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTEN ANN KUPEYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUPEYAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. Matthew's University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 19 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Oct 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Oct 2006