THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:16:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 185 Fifth Street
Toronto Ontario M8V 2Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 252-6475
Fax: (416) 252-6395

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.O. McIntyre Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. McIntyre (CPSO#: 85723 )
Business Address: LAMP CHC
185 Fifth Street
Etobicoke Ontario M8V 2Z5
(416) 252-6475
Business Address: 8500 McLaughlin Road South
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0N6
(905) 454-5000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 185 Fifth Street
Toronto Ontario M8V 2Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 252-6475
Fax: (416) 252-6395

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.O. McIntyre Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. McIntyre (CPSO#: 85723 )
Business Address: LAMP CHC
185 Fifth Street
Etobicoke Ontario M8V 2Z5
(416) 252-6475
Business Address: 8500 McLaughlin Road South
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0N6
(905) 454-5000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIGMUND OSCAR MCINTYRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCINTYRE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIGMUND OSCAR MCINTYRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCINTYRE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2006
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2006