THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:48:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Peshawar, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, PUSHTO, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Bronte St S
Treehouse Pediatrics
Suite 302
Milton ON L9T 9M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 876-5056
Fax: ()289) 6702176

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maqsood Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Oct 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ali (CPSO#: 85735 )
Business Address: Milton Kids Clinic
Building C
Unit 1
604 Santa Maria Boulevard
Milton Ontario L9T 6J5
Business Address: 10 Bronte St S
Treehouse Pediatrics
302
Milton ON L9T 9M2
905-876-5056

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, PUSHTO, URDU
Medical School: University of Peshawar, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Bronte St S
Treehouse Pediatrics
Suite 302
Milton ON L9T 9M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 876-5056
Fax: ()289) 6702176

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maqsood Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Oct 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ali (CPSO#: 85735 )
Business Address: Milton Kids Clinic
Building C
Unit 1
604 Santa Maria Boulevard
Milton Ontario L9T 6J5
Business Address: 10 Bronte St S
Treehouse Pediatrics
302
Milton ON L9T 9M2
905-876-5056

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
09 Jun 2014
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 09 2014
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Maqsood Ali may practise medicine independently in paediatrics, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Maqsood Ali may practise medicine independently in paediatrics, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Peshawar, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 May 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 May 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 2006