THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:51:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARMENIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
Room 4N-464
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4218
Fax: (416) 340-4580

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maral Ouzounian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ouzounian (CPSO#: 85765 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
Room 4N-464
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4218

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARMENIAN
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
Room 4N-464
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4218
Fax: (416) 340-4580

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maral Ouzounian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ouzounian (CPSO#: 85765 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
Room 4N-464
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4218

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARAL OUZOUNIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OUZOUNIAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARAL OUZOUNIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OUZOUNIAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2006