THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:30:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University of Beirut, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: C A M H
Room 6312
80 Workman Way
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Fax: (416) 583-1307

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 16 Apr 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 16 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Lebanon

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - Russell Street Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - Russell Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tarek K. Rajji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Rajji (CPSO#: 85792 )
Business Address: Room 6312
80 Workman Way
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
(416) 535-8501

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: American University of Beirut, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: C A M H
Room 6312
80 Workman Way
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Fax: (416) 583-1307

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 16 Apr 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 16 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Lebanon

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - Russell Street Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - Russell Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tarek K. Rajji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Rajji (CPSO#: 85792 )
Business Address: Room 6312
80 Workman Way
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
(416) 535-8501

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAREK KHALIL RAJJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJJI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAREK KHALIL RAJJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJJI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University of Beirut, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Nov 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2006