THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:52:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Ave East, Rm T2105H
Division of Thoracic Surgery
St. Joseph's Hospital
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Extension: 33556
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 05 Oct 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 05 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Comley and Finley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Comley (CPSO#: 73622 ) Dr. C. Finley (CPSO#: 85803 )
Business Address: St Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Room T2105H
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155 Extn: 33556
Business Address: Brantford General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5544
Business Address: Wallace Family Health Centre
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Ave East, Rm T2105H
Division of Thoracic Surgery
St. Joseph's Hospital
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Extension: 33556
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 05 Oct 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 05 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Comley and Finley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Comley (CPSO#: 73622 ) Dr. C. Finley (CPSO#: 85803 )
Business Address: St Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Room T2105H
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155 Extn: 33556
Business Address: Brantford General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5544
Business Address: Wallace Family Health Centre
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTIAN JOHN FINLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTIAN JOHN FINLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2006