THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:45:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of South Africa(Medun, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5565 Wyandotte Street East
Windsor Ontario N8S 4T9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 974-2924
Fax: (519) 948-9033
Address: 2462 howard avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maraj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Maraj (CPSO#: 85807 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS
Medical School: Medical University of South Africa(Medun, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5565 Wyandotte Street East
Windsor Ontario N8S 4T9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 974-2924
Fax: (519) 948-9033
Address: 2462 howard avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maraj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Maraj (CPSO#: 85807 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIKESH MARAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARAJ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIKESH MARAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARAJ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 20 Jun 2023
Summary:
Finding of Guilt

Vikesh Maraj was found guilty of the following offence:

1.  Having over 80 mg blood alcohol concentration within two hours after ceasing to operate a conveyance, contrary to s.320.14(1)(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date:  June 20, 2023
SENTENCE:  Fine of $5,000; 12 month driving prohibition; Victim fine surcharge of $1,500, Restitution payment of $14,000 for damage to property of victims.  

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 20 Jun 2023
Summary:
Finding of Guilt

Vikesh Maraj was found guilty of the following offence:

1.  Having over 80 mg blood alcohol concentration within two hours after ceasing to operate a conveyance, contrary to s.320.14(1)(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date:  June 20, 2023
SENTENCE:  Fine of $5,000; 12 month driving prohibition; Victim fine surcharge of $1,500, Restitution payment of $14,000 for damage to property of victims.  

Training

Medical School: Medical University of South Africa(Medun, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2007
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2007