THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:19:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: ZAGAZIG FACULTY OF MEDICINE, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 726 Bloor Street West
208
Toronto Ontario M6G 1L4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166566515
Fax: 4166566815

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.G. Salama Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Salama (CPSO#: 85904 )
Business Address: Keele and Rogers Medical Centre
605 Rogers Road
Suite D-5
Toronto Ontario M6M 1B9
(905) 656-6515
Business Address: 208-2221 Keele St
North York ON M6M 3Z5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: ZAGAZIG FACULTY OF MEDICINE, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 726 Bloor Street West
208
Toronto Ontario M6G 1L4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166566515
Fax: 4166566815

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.G. Salama Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Salama (CPSO#: 85904 )
Business Address: Keele and Rogers Medical Centre
605 Rogers Road
Suite D-5
Toronto Ontario M6M 1B9
(905) 656-6515
Business Address: 208-2221 Keele St
North York ON M6M 3Z5

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Discipline Committee
14 Oct 2011
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Discipline Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 14 2011
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from 12:00 p.m, October 14, 2011, by order of the Discipline Committee of
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
by Dr. Magdy Gamil Abdou Salama:

Dr. Salama shall not participate in any research studies or activities of
any kind at any time.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from 12:00 p.m, October 14, 2011, by order of the Discipline Committee of
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
by Dr. Magdy Gamil Abdou Salama:

Dr. Salama shall not participate in any research studies or activities of
any kind at any time.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 14 Oct 2011
Summary of Decision:
On October 14, 2011, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Magdy Gamil Abdou Salama committed an act of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in conducting research.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. The Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitation on Dr. Salama(s certificate of registration:

I) Dr. Salama shall not participate in any research studies or activities of any kind at any time; and
ii) Dr. Salama shall, at his own expense, participate in and successfully complete an education program in medical ethics and informed consent organized and approved by the College.

2. Dr. Salama appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

3. Dr. Salama pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650 within thirty (30 days from the date of this Order.

4. The results of this proceeding be included in the register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): October 14, 2011

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 14 Oct 2011
Summary of Decision:
On October 14, 2011, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Magdy Gamil Abdou Salama committed an act of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in conducting research.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. The Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitation on Dr. Salama(s certificate of registration:

I) Dr. Salama shall not participate in any research studies or activities of any kind at any time; and
ii) Dr. Salama shall, at his own expense, participate in and successfully complete an education program in medical ethics and informed consent organized and approved by the College.

2. Dr. Salama appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

3. Dr. Salama pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650 within thirty (30 days from the date of this Order.

4. The results of this proceeding be included in the register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): October 14, 2011

Training

Medical School: ZAGAZIG FACULTY OF MEDICINE, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 2007