THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:25:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tamil Nadu Dr. M.G.R. Medical University, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Trafalgar Hospital
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197840085
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 18 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nethirasigamani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Nethirasigamani (CPSO#: 85925 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: Tamil Nadu Dr. M.G.R. Medical University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Trafalgar Hospital
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197840085
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 18 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nethirasigamani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Nethirasigamani (CPSO#: 85925 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DINESH NETHIRASIGAMANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NETHIRASIGAMANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DINESH NETHIRASIGAMANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NETHIRASIGAMANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tamil Nadu Dr. M.G.R. Medical University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Feb 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Apr 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2007