THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:36:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Colombo, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALA, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ashgrove Medical Building
Suite 101
6633 Hwy 7
Markham Ontario L3P 7P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 471-6621
Fax: (905) 471-6631

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Sri Lanka

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chitralekha Abeysinghe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Abeysinghe (CPSO#: 85929 )
Business Address: Ashgrove Medical Building
101 - 6633 Highway 7
Markham Ontario L3P 7P2
(905) 471-6621

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALA, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Colombo, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ashgrove Medical Building
Suite 101
6633 Hwy 7
Markham Ontario L3P 7P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 471-6621
Fax: (905) 471-6631

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Sri Lanka

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chitralekha Abeysinghe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Abeysinghe (CPSO#: 85929 )
Business Address: Ashgrove Medical Building
101 - 6633 Highway 7
Markham Ontario L3P 7P2
(905) 471-6621

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHITRALEKHA RASANJALI ABEYSINGHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABEYSINGHE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHITRALEKHA RASANJALI ABEYSINGHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABEYSINGHE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Colombo, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2007
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2007