THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:12:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 477 Grove Street East
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 720-2427
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematological Pathology
Effective: 29 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematological Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Khzam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khzam (CPSO#: 85970 )
Business Address: 620 Bloor Street
Mississauga Ontario L5A 3C9
(905) 277-1222
Business Address: Saint John Regional Hospital
P O Box 2100
St John New Brunswick E2L 4L2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 477 Grove Street East
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 720-2427
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematological Pathology
Effective: 29 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematological Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Khzam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khzam (CPSO#: 85970 )
Business Address: 620 Bloor Street
Mississauga Ontario L5A 3C9
(905) 277-1222
Business Address: Saint John Regional Hospital
P O Box 2100
St John New Brunswick E2L 4L2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMED OMAR S KHZAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHZAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMED OMAR S KHZAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHZAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Feb 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 2007