THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:34:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of South Africa(Medun, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, LINGALA, SWAHILI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 619 Prospect Blvd
Midland ON L4R 0G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055277575
Fax: 7055277571

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chabikuli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chabikuli (CPSO#: 86024 ) Dr. K. Mossanda Chabikuli (CPSO#: 87773 )
Business Address: Suite 103
240 Old Penetanguishene Road
P O Box 790
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
(705) 527-7575
Business Address: 619 Prospect Blvd
Midland ON L4R 0G3
7055277575

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, LINGALA, SWAHILI
Medical School: Medical University of South Africa(Medun, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 619 Prospect Blvd
Midland ON L4R 0G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055277575
Fax: 7055277571

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chabikuli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chabikuli (CPSO#: 86024 ) Dr. K. Mossanda Chabikuli (CPSO#: 87773 )
Business Address: Suite 103
240 Old Penetanguishene Road
P O Box 790
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
(705) 527-7575
Business Address: 619 Prospect Blvd
Midland ON L4R 0G3
7055277575

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIBOMANA CHABIKULI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHABIKULI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIBOMANA CHABIKULI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHABIKULI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 08 Feb 2017
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP: 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 08 Feb 2017
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP: 

Training

Medical School: Medical University of South Africa(Medun, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2007
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2007