THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:19:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MALAY, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 215 Fanshawe Park Road West
unit 202
London Ontario N6G 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196017171
Fax: 5196017174
Address: Suite 110, 525 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener Ontario N2M5E2
Phone: 5196219257
Fax: 5192088182
Address: 13158 Tecumseh Road East, Suite 4
Windsor Ontario N8N 3T6
Phone: (519) 948-0766
Fax: (519) 948-2681

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 26 Oct 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ganesh Ram Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Ram (CPSO#: 86064 )
Business Address: 3955 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N8W 1J5
(519) 601-7171
Business Address: St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100
Business Address: Woodstock General Hospital
270 Riddell Street
Woodstock Ontario N4S 6N6
(519) 421-4211
Business Address: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg Ontario N4G 3Y9
(519) 842-3611

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MALAY, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 215 Fanshawe Park Road West
unit 202
London Ontario N6G 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196017171
Fax: 5196017174
Address: Suite 110, 525 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener Ontario N2M5E2
Phone: 5196219257
Fax: 5192088182
Address: 13158 Tecumseh Road East, Suite 4
Windsor Ontario N8N 3T6
Phone: (519) 948-0766
Fax: (519) 948-2681

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 26 Oct 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ganesh Ram Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Ram (CPSO#: 86064 )
Business Address: 3955 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N8W 1J5
(519) 601-7171
Business Address: St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100
Business Address: Woodstock General Hospital
270 Riddell Street
Woodstock Ontario N4S 6N6
(519) 421-4211
Business Address: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg Ontario N4G 3Y9
(519) 842-3611

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GANESH HARIRAMA RAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GANESH HARIRAMA RAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 May 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 May 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2007