THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 09:43:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Ave E
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
F507
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055221155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 25 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Goffin Rudkowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rudkowski (CPSO#: 86067 ) Dr. J. Goffin (CPSO#: 69872 )
Business Address: St Joseph's Health Care
Dept of General Internal Medicine
Suite F507
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155
Business Address: Juravinski Cancer Centre
Suite 3-15
699 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
(905) 387-9495

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Ave E
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
F507
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055221155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 25 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Goffin Rudkowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rudkowski (CPSO#: 86067 ) Dr. J. Goffin (CPSO#: 69872 )
Business Address: St Joseph's Health Care
Dept of General Internal Medicine
Suite F507
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155
Business Address: Juravinski Cancer Centre
Suite 3-15
699 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
(905) 387-9495

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JILL CAROLE RUDKOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUDKOWSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JILL CAROLE RUDKOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUDKOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2007