THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:37:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Finch Weston Family Health Organiza
2367 FInch Avenue West - Unit B
Toronto Ontario M9M 2W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 900-6697
Fax: (416) 900-6041

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Al-Saigh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Al-Saigh (CPSO#: 86161 )
Business Address: Finch Weston Family Health Organization
B - 2367 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M9M 2W8
(416) 900-0697

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Finch Weston Family Health Organiza
2367 FInch Avenue West - Unit B
Toronto Ontario M9M 2W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 900-6697
Fax: (416) 900-6041

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Al-Saigh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Al-Saigh (CPSO#: 86161 )
Business Address: Finch Weston Family Health Organization
B - 2367 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M9M 2W8
(416) 900-0697

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BASIL BEHNAM AL-SAIGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-SAIGH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BASIL BEHNAM AL-SAIGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-SAIGH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 May 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 May 2007
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 May 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 May 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 May 2007