THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:20:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Units 19 - 20
6175 Highway 7
Vaughan Ontario L4H 0P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 297-8362
Fax: 416-840-8434

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 03 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V. Kunanithy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Kunanithy (CPSO#: 86206 )
Business Address: Unit 19 - 20
6175 Highway 7
Vaughan Ontario L4H 0P6
(416) 297-8362

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Units 19 - 20
6175 Highway 7
Vaughan Ontario L4H 0P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 297-8362
Fax: 416-840-8434

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 03 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V. Kunanithy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Kunanithy (CPSO#: 86206 )
Business Address: Unit 19 - 20
6175 Highway 7
Vaughan Ontario L4H 0P6
(416) 297-8362

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VITHARANI KUNANITHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUNANITHY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VITHARANI KUNANITHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUNANITHY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007