THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:45:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
room 438
Brockville Ontario K6V 1S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-342-8181
Fax: 613-342-8338

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Burghardt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Burghardt (CPSO#: 86240 )
Business Address: Childrens Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-7600
Business Address: Brockville General Hospital
438 - 75 Charles Street
Brockville Ontario K6V 1S8
(613) 345-5649

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
room 438
Brockville Ontario K6V 1S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-342-8181
Fax: 613-342-8338

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Burghardt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Burghardt (CPSO#: 86240 )
Business Address: Childrens Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-7600
Business Address: Brockville General Hospital
438 - 75 Charles Street
Brockville Ontario K6V 1S8
(613) 345-5649

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAROLINA MARIA BURGHARDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURGHARDT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAROLINA MARIA BURGHARDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURGHARDT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007