THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:40:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: Stanculescu, Cristina Ioana (Used Until: 22 Nov 2010)
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto East General Hospital
Emergency Department
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 469-6435
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cristina I. Pastia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Pastia (CPSO#: 86244 )
Business Address: Toronto East General Hospital
Emergency Department
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 469-6580

General Information

Former Name: Stanculescu, Cristina Ioana (Used Until: 22 Nov 2010)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto East General Hospital
Emergency Department
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 469-6435
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cristina I. Pastia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Pastia (CPSO#: 86244 )
Business Address: Toronto East General Hospital
Emergency Department
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 469-6580

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CRISTINA IOANA PASTIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASTIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CRISTINA IOANA PASTIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASTIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007