THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:23:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 209-1101 2nd Ave E
Owen Sound ON N4K 2J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193721111
Fax: 5193721112
Address: 1800 8th St E
Brightshores Health System
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Toronto Clinic
55 Avenue Road
Suite 2000, East Tower
Toronto Ontario M5R 3L2
Phone: 416-849-5555
Fax: 416-849-5551

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 09 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Giuseppe Costa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Costa (CPSO#: 86293 )
Business Address: 9651 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 1V7
9058836614
Business Address: 209-1101 2nd Ave E
Owen Sound ON N4K 2J1
519-372-1111
Business Address: 209-1101 2nd Ave E
Owen Sound ON N4K 2J1
5193721111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 209-1101 2nd Ave E
Owen Sound ON N4K 2J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193721111
Fax: 5193721112
Address: 1800 8th St E
Brightshores Health System
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Toronto Clinic
55 Avenue Road
Suite 2000, East Tower
Toronto Ontario M5R 3L2
Phone: 416-849-5555
Fax: 416-849-5551

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 09 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Giuseppe Costa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Costa (CPSO#: 86293 )
Business Address: 9651 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 1V7
9058836614
Business Address: 209-1101 2nd Ave E
Owen Sound ON N4K 2J1
519-372-1111
Business Address: 209-1101 2nd Ave E
Owen Sound ON N4K 2J1
5193721111

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GIUSEPPE COSTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COSTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GIUSEPPE COSTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COSTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Mar 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Dec 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Mar 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Mar 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007