THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:34:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Pontificia-Catolica Do Rio Grande Do Sul, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Thoracic Surgery
200 Elizabeth Street
North Wing Room 9N 969
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-5156
Fax: 416 3403478

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 01 Sep 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
General Surgery
Effective: 01 Sep 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marcelo Cypel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cypel (CPSO#: 86294 )
Business Address: 416 9392633
Business Address:

Corporation Name: Dr. Marcelo Cypel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Nov 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH
Medical School: Pontificia-Catolica Do Rio Grande Do Sul, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Thoracic Surgery
200 Elizabeth Street
North Wing Room 9N 969
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-5156
Fax: 416 3403478

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 01 Sep 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
General Surgery
Effective: 01 Sep 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marcelo Cypel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cypel (CPSO#: 86294 )
Business Address: 416 9392633
Business Address:

Corporation Name: Dr. Marcelo Cypel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Nov 2021

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Aug 2016
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 12 2016
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Marcelo Cypel may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
Division of Thoracic Surgery, University of Toronto in which Dr.
Cypel holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate
Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Cypel no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Marcelo Cypel may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
Division of Thoracic Surgery, University of Toronto in which Dr.
Cypel holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate
Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Cypel no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Pontificia-Catolica Do Rio Grande Do Sul, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007